CV(Application Form)Aleksandr * * * * * *
Certified for:
Crewell ID: 42694
First class engineer |
|
Main info | |||
Name / Surname: | Aleksandr * * * * * * | ||
Position applied for: |
Chief Engineer
Superintendent
|
Desired Vessel Type: |
Offshore fleet
Onshore jobs
|
Minimum salary $: | 250 | Birthday / Place of birth: | * * * * * * |
Phones: | * * * * * * | Citizenship: | Russia |
E-mail: | * * * * * * | Country of residence / City: | * * * * * * |
Messenger: | * * * * * * | Home address: | * * * * * * |
English level: | Good | Closest airport: | * * * * * * |
USA visa valid up: | No | Schengen visa valid up: | No |
Passports / Smbk | ||||
Title of document | No. | Date of issue | Country of issue | Valid up |
Seaman's book | ****** | 02.04.2021 | Russia | 04.05.2025 |
International passport | ****** | 01.04.2016 | Russia | 14.03.2026 |
Diplomas | ||||
Title of document | No. | Date of issue | Country of issue | Valid up |
Rank | First class engineer | |||
Professional license | ****** | 30.06.2020 | Russia | 30.06.2025 |
Endorsement |
Certificates | ||||
Title of document | No. | Date of issue | Country of issue | Valid up |
Basic Safety Training | ****** | 24.03.2020 | Russia | 24.03.2025 |
Advanced Fire Fighting | ****** | 05.06.2020 | Russia | 05.06.2025 |
Proficiency in Survival Craft and RB | ****** | 11.03.2020 | Russia | 11.04.2025 |
Medical First Aid | ****** | 17.06.2020 | Russia | 17.06.2025 |
DP Basic Course | ****** | 03.04.2013 | Ukraine | 01.04.2020 |
Electro Equipment | ****** | 30.04.2010 | Ukraine | 25.04.2025 |
DP Full | ****** | 29.05.2013 | Ukraine | 29.05.2025 |
Helicopter HUET EBS | ****** | 25.08.2019 | Kazakstan | 24.08.2023 |
Security Awareness Training | ****** | 26.03.2020 | Россия | 26.03.2025 |
Medical certificates | ||||
Title of document | No. | Date of issue | Country of issue | Valid up |
Seafarer medical certificate | ****** | 03.03.2022 | Russia | 03.03.2023 |
Sea service (last 5 years) | |||||
Position | Vessel Name / Flag | Vessel type / DWT | ME Type / kW | From - Till | Shipowner / Country |
Chief Engineer | ****** | ASD Tug / 1100 | Caterpillar / 6040 | 15.01.2022 - 25.06.2022 | ****** |
Superintendent | ****** | Jack-Up Barge / 3523 | MTU / 30750 | 12.11.2019 - 15.01.2020 |
******
|
Superintendent | ****** | Crew boat / 457 | MTU / 4840 | 10.01.2019 - 10.11.2019 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | ASD Tug / 333 | Caterpillar / 2236 | 30.10.2018 - 04.01.2019 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | Multi-Purpose Vessel / 3846 | Wartsila / 2840 | 17.07.2017 - 20.10.2017 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | Tug / 230 | RD / 1380 | 26.01.2016 - 15.02.2017 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | Bunkering tanker / 1581 | SKL / 2800 | 09.02.2015 - 15.04.2015 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | MPSV DP2 / 3347 | Niigata / 6000 | 05.09.2014 - 08.10.2014 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | ROV support vessel / 1727 | Caterpillar / 5150 | 07.03.2014 - 07.05.2014 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | ROV support vessel / 1695 | Caterpillar / 5150 | 10.11.2013 - 10.01.2014 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | AHTS / 1678 | Caterpillar / 5250 | 02.07.2013 - 05.09.2013 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | AHTS / 1494 | Cummins / 7200 | 16.10.2012 - 18.01.2013 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | Survey vessel / 1473 | Caterpillar / 6040 | 06.02.2012 - 06.05.2012 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | AHTS / 1674 | Caterpillar / 5500 | 24.12.2010 - 26.06.2011 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | AHTS / 1598 | Wartsila / 7000 | 04.06.2010 - 18.08.2010 | ****** |
Chief Engineer | ****** | Tug / 369 | Deutz / 3120 | 13.01.2010 - 12.04.2010 | ****** |
Biometrics | ||
Sex: male | Height: 173 | Overall size: xxl |
Eyes color: Gray | Weight: 92 | Shoe size: 42 |
Additional info | |||
Maritime education:
|
* * * * * * |
Additional skills:
|
|
Speciality:
|
First-class engineer |
Knowledge of other languages:
|
|
Next of Kin | |||
Next of kin:
|
* * * * * * |
Kin phone:
|
* * * * * * |
Kin name, Surname:
|
* * * * * * |
Kin address:
|
* * * * * * |