CV(Application Form)Aleksandr * * * * * *
Certified for:
Crewell ID: 56119
Master |
|
Main info | |||
Name / Surname: | Aleksandr * * * * * * | ||
Position applied for: |
Master
|
Desired Vessel Type: |
Offshore fleet
|
Minimum salary $: | 200 | Birthday / Place of birth: | * * * * * * |
Phones: | * * * * * * | Citizenship: | Russia |
E-mail: | * * * * * * | Country of residence / City: | * * * * * * |
Messenger: | * * * * * * | Home address: | * * * * * * |
English level: | Good | Closest airport: | * * * * * * |
USA visa valid up: | No | Schengen visa valid up: | No |
Passports / Smbk | ||||
Title of document | No. | Date of issue | Country of issue | Valid up |
Seaman's book | ****** | 01.03.2012 | Russia | 01.03.2022 |
International passport | ****** | 28.05.2021 | Russia | 28.05.2030 |
Diplomas | ||||
Title of document | No. | Date of issue | Country of issue | Valid up |
Rank | Master | |||
Professional license | ****** | 25.04.2019 | Russia | 21.07.2023 |
Endorsement |
Certificates | ||||
Title of document | No. | Date of issue | Country of issue | Valid up |
Basic Safety Training and Instruction | ****** | 29.11.2018 | Russia | 29.11.2023 |
Advanced Fire Fighting | ****** | 01.12.2018 | Russia | 01.12.2023 |
Proficiency in Survival Craft and RB | ****** | 30.11.2018 | Russia | 30.11.2023 |
Medical First Aid | ****** | 13.12.2018 | Russia | 13.12.2023 |
GMDSS Operator | ****** | 17.12.2018 | Russia | 14.11.2023 |
Ship Security Officer | ****** | 21.07.2018 | Russia | 21.07.2023 |
Radar Management (ARPA+Radar) | ****** | 21.11.2018 | Russia | 14.11.2023 |
ECDIS | ****** | 17.12.2018 | Russia | 17.12.2023 |
Fast Rescue Boats course | ****** | 15.06.2015 | Russia | 15.06.2020 |
Bridge Team Management | ****** | 27.07.2018 | Kazakhstan | 27.07.2024 |
Medical certificates | ||||
Title of document | No. | Date of issue | Country of issue | Valid up |
Certificate of Fitness | ****** | 27.12.2018 | Russia | 27.12.2019 |
Flag Documents and Other Countries Seaman's Books | ||||
Country | Document type | No. | Date of issue | Valid up |
United Arab Emirates | Endorsement | ****** | 13.12.2013 | 12.12.2018 |
Sea service (last 5 years) | |||||
Position | Vessel Name / Flag | Vessel type / DWT | ME Type / kW | From - Till | Shipowner / Country |
Master | ****** | PSV / 1208 | Caterpillar / 3089 | 18.03.2022 - 20.04.2022 | ****** |
Master | ****** | AHTS DP1 / 1366 | Wartsila / 4082 | 11.07.2021 - 25.12.2021 | ****** |
Master | ****** | PSV / 1208 | Caterpillar / 3089 | 03.09.2020 - 15.04.2020 | ****** |
Master | ****** | PSV / 1208 | Caterpillar / 3089 | 01.04.2020 - 15.07.2020 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | PSV / 1208 | Caterpillar / 3089 | 25.10.2019 - 10.02.2020 |
******
|
Chief Officer | ****** | Ro-Ro / 6400 | Caterpillar / 2982 | 26.05.2019 - 06.08.2019 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | Ro-Ro / 6400 | Caterpillar / 2982 | 05.01.2019 - 10.04.2019 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | Ro-Ro / 6400 | Caterpillar / 2982 | 31.08.2018 - 05.11.2018 | ****** |
Master | ****** | Tug / 111 | Wartsila / 1588 | 25.06.2018 - 15.07.2018 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | AHT / 403 | Cummins / 2464 | 20.02.2018 - 20.06.2018 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | AHTS / 400 | Wartsila / 3600 | 03.09.2017 - 27.11.2017 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | Tug / 111 | Wartsila / 1588 | 15.09.2016 - 26.02.2017 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | Tug / 57 | Daihatsu / 882 | 31.05.2016 - 05.08.2016 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | Tug / 111 | Wartsila / 1588 | 11.01.2016 - 14.04.2016 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | Supply vessel / 541 | Cummins / 2500 | 07.10.2013 - 02.04.2015 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | Tug / 57 | NVD / 1176 | 22.03.2013 - 21.08.2013 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | AHTS / 111 | Wartsila / 1588 | 03.05.2012 - 25.01.2013 | ****** |
Chief Officer | ****** | Tug / 73 | NVD / 1029 | 17.11.2010 - 30.01.2012 | ****** |
2nd Officer | ****** | Tug / 95 | Mitsubishi / 883 | 07.10.2008 - 17.11.2010 | ****** |
Biometrics | ||
Sex: male | Height: 178 | Overall size: 54 |
Eyes color: Green | Weight: 87 | Shoe size: 43 |
Additional info | |||
Maritime education:
|
* * * * * * |
Additional skills:
|
none |
Speciality:
|
Navigator |
Knowledge of other languages:
|
russian |
Next of Kin | |||
Next of kin:
|
* * * * * * |
Kin phone:
|
* * * * * * |
Kin name, Surname:
|
* * * * * * |
Kin address:
|
* * * * * * |
Notes | |||
* * * * * * |